Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported with amendments (9-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|