House | 05/08/2024 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 29, nays 57. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/2024. | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | Reported with amendments (13-4). | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Prefiled. |