Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Read by title. The Senate failed to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 16 yeas and 22 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
By a vote of 100 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Notice House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 9 yeas and 30 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 24. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported favorably (18-2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported with amendments (8-2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|