House
|
06/11/2024
|
Effective date: 08/01/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 618.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 71, nays 18, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 18 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 19 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 18. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|