House
|
06/03/2024
|
Becomes Act No. 407.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported without amendments (11-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Reported favorably (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/2/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|