Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 28. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 48. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported with amendments (12-2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|