Senate | 03/25/2024 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 32. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/19/2024. | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Reported with amendments (12*0). | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Prefiled. |