House | 05/01/2024 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 43, nays 51. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024. | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/2024. | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Reported with amendments (7-6). | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Prefiled. |