Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 17. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/27/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Reported with amendments (18-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|