House
|
06/19/2024
|
Effective date: 08/01/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 714.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Bass, Edmonds, and Talbot.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Green, Firment, and Brown.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/23/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported with amendments (19-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|