Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/08/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported with amendments (10-2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|