House | 05/20/2024 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2024. | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2024. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Reported favorably (8-5). | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Prefiled. |