House
|
05/23/2024
|
Effective date: 08/01/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 189.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/22/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/9/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|