House | 04/25/2024 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Reported with amendments (10-0). | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Discharged from the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Prefiled. |