Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/20/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Reported with amendments (18-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|