House
|
06/25/2024
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2024
|
Becomes Act No. 789 without the Governor's signature.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Notice Senate recommitted to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Notice Senate discharged the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
The Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee members discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
The House recommitted the bill to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Notice the House discharged the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Discharged from Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Miller, Luneau, and Seabaugh.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Muscarello, McFarland, and Melerine.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported favorably (11-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|