House
|
06/19/2024
|
Effective date: 06/19/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 726.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 2, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Reported favorably (10-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|