House
|
05/29/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Reported with amendments (12-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|