Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/22/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|