House
|
06/10/2024
|
Effective date: 08/01/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 572.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/28/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|