Senate | 05/22/2024 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/2024. | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Reported with amendments (11-0). | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |