Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/27/24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 51, nays 50. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/20/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Reported favorably (10-2-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/16/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|