House
|
06/11/2024
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 640.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 26 yeas and 8 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Talbot, Seabaugh, and Miguez.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Emerson, Beaullieu, and Thomas.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported with amendments (21-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|