House
|
06/11/2024
|
Effective date: 08/01/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 596.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported with amendments (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported favorably (10-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/16/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|