LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB919
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB919
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2024 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB919
Action History
House
05/14/2024
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
House
05/13/2024
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/2024.
House
05/13/2024
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
05/09/2024
Reported with amendments (8-5).
House
04/03/2024
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
House
04/02/2024
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.