LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB936
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB936
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2024 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB936
Action History
House
04/30/2024
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
House
04/29/2024
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024.
House
04/23/2024
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
04/22/2024
Reported with amendments (7-6).
House
04/03/2024
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
House
04/02/2024
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.