Senate | 05/23/2024 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 17. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2024. | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Reported favorably (21-0). | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Reported favorably (11-0). | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |