House
|
06/19/2024
|
Effective date: 08/01/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 678.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 84, nays 10, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 12 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 11. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Reported favorably (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/16/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|