House
|
06/18/2024
|
Effective date: 08/01/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 666.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Notice of Senate discharged the Comference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee members discharged.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Notice the House discharged the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Discharged from Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Hensgens, Luneau, and Talbot.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Owen, Miller, and Melerine.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/30/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 306 reported by the Committee on Health and Welfare (10-0).
|
|
|