House
|
06/19/2024
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 820 reported by the Committee on Judiciary (12-0).
|
|
|