House
|
05/07/2024
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/1/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 102, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/26/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Reported favorably (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|