Senate | 05/23/2024 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Reported with amendments (10-0). | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |