Senate | 05/28/2024 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 71, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2024. | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Reported favorably (13-0). | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |