House | 03/22/2024 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |