House
|
06/03/2024
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/28/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 89, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Reported favorably (7-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|