House
|
05/22/2024
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 91, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|