House
|
06/04/2024
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 103, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 8 for 04/25/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported favorably (22-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|