House
|
06/04/2024
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 77, nays 17, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title, amended and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 67, nays 27. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Reported favorably (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Reported favorably (11-5-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|