House | 04/11/2024 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 4/4/2024. | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |