House | 04/25/2024 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |