House | 04/29/2024 | Returned to house of origin and approved on 4/26/2024. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved on 4/25/2024. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Study request list distributed to the members on 4/22/2024. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Request study by the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Received by the Senate Office on 4/22/2024. | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Sent to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Study request list distributed to members on 4/15/2024. | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Received on 3/12/2024. |