House | 05/16/2024 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2024. | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2024. | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Reported favorably (10-0-1). | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |