House
|
05/16/2024
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Read by title.
|
|
|