Louisiana 2024 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR132 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

                            ENROLLED
2024 Regular Session
HOUSE RESOLUTION NO. 132
BY REPRESENTATIVE LAFLEUR
A RESOLUTION
To commend Reverend Ronnie O. Blake on the occasion of his fifth pastoral anniversary.
WHEREAS, Reverend Ronnie O. Blake is the second of seven children born to
Nathaniel and Johnnie Blake; he is a native of Grambling, Louisiana, where he received his
primary and secondary education, and he earned a Bachelor of Arts degree in biology at
Grambling State University; and
WHEREAS, Ronnie Blake was baptized at an early age by Reverend B. M. White
at Oakland Baptist Church in Shreveport, Louisiana; he accepted the call to preach the
Gospel in 1988 under the guidance of Reverend Charles L. Jackson at Pleasant Grove Baptist
Church in Houston, Texas; and 
WHEREAS, Reverend Blake became a licensed minister on May 24, 1992; he was
ordained a minister of the Gospel by the Fourth District Missionary Baptist Association on
February 4, 1994, while serving under the leadership of Reverend Dr. Jesse B. Bilberry, Jr.;
additionally, he served as the interim pastor at Glen Oaks Baptist Church in Baton Rouge
from June 1997 until June 1998; and
WHEREAS, Reverend Blake pursued religious education at numerous institutions;
he received a degree in Christian education from Capital City Religious Institute in Baton
Rouge in 1994, and he earned a bachelor's degree in theology at Christian Bible College on
June 14, 2004; he received certification from the American Association of Christian
Counselors as a certified Christian counselor on June 1, 2007; he returned to Christian Bible
College and completed a Doctor of Divinity degree on June 6, 2008; and
Page 1 of 2 HR NO. 132	ENROLLED
WHEREAS, Reverend Blake is a member of the National Baptist Convention, the
Fourth District Missionary Baptist Association, and the East Baton Rouge Parish Ministers
Conference; he is married to Izetta VanBuren Blake; and
WHEREAS, Revered Blake has served at Mount Pilgrim Baptist Church since 1990,
and he led Mount Pilgrim's street ministry; he taught Sunday school in the adult division of
the Higher Ground Fellowship Hour and led weekly Bible study; he led Christian education
courses at various Fourth District Missionary Baptist Association and Louisiana Missionary
Baptist State Convention events; and
WHEREAS, Reverend Ronnie O. Blake was elected the ninth pastor of Mount
Pilgrim Baptist Church on March 19, 2019, and he is most deserving of the highest
recognition for his outstanding leadership over the course of the past five years.
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the
Legislature of Louisiana does hereby commend Reverend Ronnie O. Blake on the occasion
of his fifth pastoral anniversary and does hereby extend sincerest wishes that he continue to
prosper in all of his endeavors as he leads the Mount Pilgrim Baptist Church family.
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Page 2 of 2