House | 06/03/2024 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 05/30/2024 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/29/2024 | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/29/2024 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/28/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2024. | ||
House | 05/28/2024 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/28/2024 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2024. | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Reported with amendments (9-0). | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |