House | 05/31/2024 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 05/29/2024 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/28/2024 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2024. | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |