HLS 24RS-4267 ORIGINAL 2024 Regular Session HOUSE RESOLUTION NO. 261 BY REPRESENTATIVE PHELPS HEALTH/SICKLE CELL ANEM: Directs the Louisiana Department of Health to meet certain benchmarks to launch the Sickle Cell Disease Registry 1 A RESOLUTION 2To direct the Louisiana Department of Health to meet certain benchmarks to launch the 3 Sickle Cell Disease Registry. 4 WHEREAS, sickle cell disease in an inherited blood disorder that affects one in three 5hundred and seventy-five African Americans; and 6 WHEREAS, sickle cell disease affects people across the world of all backgrounds, 7the greatest number of affected patients in the United States are those with African ancestry; 8and 9 WHEREAS, sickle cell anemia was the first genetic disease to be examined at the 10molecular level, and the first article documenting a case of sickle cell anemia was published 11in 1910; and 12 WHEREAS, despite the history of study and interest in sickle cell anemia, it took 13over one hundred years for this state to establish the Sickle Cell Commission; and 14 WHEREAS, sickle cell disease is recognized by national health organizations such 15as the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, the United States Department of Health 16and Human Services, the Health Resources and Services Administration, and the American 17Society of Hematology as a condition long overdue for the investment of resources to 18improve the health and quality of life of individuals living with sickle cell disease; and 19 WHEREAS, the Legislature of Louisiana has enacted over twenty legislative 20instruments related to healthcare access, quality, supportive services, and data collection for 21sickle cell disease to date; and Page 1 of 4 HLS 24RS-4267 ORIGINAL HR NO. 261 1 WHEREAS, in 2022, the Legislature of Louisiana enacted Act No. 647, which 2created the Sickle Cell Disease Registry, the "Skylar-Cooper Database", and tasked the 3Louisiana Department of Health with collecting patient information from healthcare 4providers around the state to connect patients with healthcare advocates and associations to 5assist individuals suffering with sickle cell disease; and 6 WHEREAS, despite efforts by legislators, community leaders, healthcare 7organizations, and policymakers, the number of patients diagnosed with sickle cell disease 8in this state remains unknown; and 9 WHEREAS, in 2024, the Sickle Cell Disease Registry remains unenforced by the 10Louisiana Department of Health and is unable to provide valuable data and information that 11are needed by state and community leaders, healthcare providers, and sickle cell associations 12to provide community assistance and to connect individuals with sickle cell disease to the 13care that they need; and 14 WHEREAS, in 2023, the United States Food and Drug Administration approved a 15powerful treatment for sickle cell disease utilizing Clustered Regularly Interspaced Short 16Palindromic Repeats or "CRISPR" gene therapy; and 17 WHEREAS, Children's Hospital in New Orleans is among one of the first hospitals 18in the nation and the only hospital in this state authorized to provide this life-changing 19treatment. 20 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the 21Legislature of Louisiana does hereby direct the Louisiana Department of Health to meet 22certain benchmarks to launch the Sickle Cell Disease Registry. 23 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the Legislature 24of Louisiana does hereby direct the Louisiana Department of Health to execute a 25memorandum of understanding or data use agreement with healthcare providers and sickle 26cell associations in this state to govern the transfer of patient contact information by July 1, 272024. 28 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the Legislature 29of Louisiana does hereby direct the Louisiana Department of Health to submit a report 30describing the memorandum of understanding or data use agreement and listing the Page 2 of 4 HLS 24RS-4267 ORIGINAL HR NO. 261 1healthcare providers and sickle cell associations that have agreed to the terms of the 2memorandum of understanding or data use agreement to the House and Senate committees 3on health and welfare and the Louisiana Sickle Cell Commission by July 15, 2024. 4 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the Legislature 5of Louisiana does hereby direct the Louisiana Department of Health to begin developing the 6necessary administrative rules to enforce the Sickle Cell Disease Registry by August 1, 72024. 8 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the Legislature 9of Louisiana does hereby direct the Louisiana Department of Health to submit a report 10summarizing the content and purpose of the administrative rules to the House and Senate 11committees on health and welfare and the Louisiana Sickle Cell Commission by August 15, 122024. 13 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the Legislature 14of Louisiana does hereby direct the Louisiana Department of Health to begin analyzing data 15from existing sources to assess the quality of the data including but not limited to removing 16duplicate entries and assessing the completeness of geographic information by November 171, 2024. 18 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the Legislature 19of Louisiana does hereby direct the Louisiana Department of Health to fully launch the 20Sickle Cell Disease Registry by December 24, 2024. 21 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this resolution be transmitted to the 22secretary of the Louisiana Department of Health and the chairman and vice chairman of the 23Louisiana Sickle Cell Commission. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HR 261 Original 2024 Regular Session Phelps Directs the La. Dept. of Health (LDH) to meet certain benchmarks toward establishing the Sickle Cell Disease Registry, including fully launching the registry by Dec. 24, 2024. Requires LDH to submit a report describing the memorandum of understanding or data use agreement executed by LDH and healthcare providers to facilitate the transfer of information Page 3 of 4 HLS 24RS-4267 ORIGINAL HR NO. 261 about patients with sickle cell disease to the House and Senate committees on health and welfare and the La. Sickle Cell Commission by July 15, 2024. Requires LDH to submit a report summarizing the content and purpose of administrative rules to House and Senate committees on health and welfare and the La. Sickle Cell Commission by Aug. 15, 2024. Page 4 of 4