House | 05/16/2024 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 71, nays 22. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/2024. | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Reported with amendments (11-0). | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |