House | 04/16/2024 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/2024. | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Reported favorably (14-0). | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |