Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Effective date 8/1/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 164.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 8. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported with amendments (12-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|